STAND IN THE GAP - DIVINE AMBASSADORS FOR CHRIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We seek to assist in bringing the community & families together, engaging all ages in outreach & religious activities. We target young people 11-15 yrs old with level of truancy, underachievement, social exclusion & 16-26 yrs old who are disadvantaged, unemployed, victims of crime thus providing activities including skills for life, befriending, holistic 1-2-1 counselling, crime prevention forum
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Ghana
- Ireland
- Nigeria
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 29 March 2005: Standard registration
- STAND IN THE GAP (Working name)
- DIVINE AMBASSADORS FOR CHRIST STAND IN THE GAP (Previous name)
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ZINA KELLY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Umu Owa | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Onokwai | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Florence Campbell | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Hamed | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Sesay | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pastor MRS CHRISTABEL HAMED | Trustee | 06 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND TIMOTHY LARYEA PABIFIO | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £498 | £3.70k | £1.48k | £8.94k | £4.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1 | £1.49k | £1.92k | £8.01k | £5.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 March 2024 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/10/2004 AS AMENDED ON 28/02/2005 AS AMENDED ON 11/02/2010 AS AMENDED ON 31/07/2014
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY TO THOSE LIVING IN DEPRIVED LOCALITIES WITHIN BASIS OF LEVELS OF DEPRIVATION, THE HOMELESS, ETHNIC MINORITY. ADVANCE IN EDUCATION, PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF YOUNG PEOPLE CURRENTLY NOT ENGAGED IN EDUCATION, EMPLOYMENT OR TRAINING OR AT RISK OF DROPPING OUT OF FULL TIME EDUCATION IN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, ADVICE AND TRAINING. THE PROVISION OF RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES, SUPPORT TO VICTIMS OF CRIME AND FORUM FOR CRIME PREVENTION. TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH IN NORTH AND EAST LONDON, ESSEX, ENFIELD, HARINGEY, AND HACKNEY. 2. TO HELP AND ENGAGE CHILDREN 2 TO 4 YEARS AND YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 11 TO 26 AND ALSO PARENTS TO ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY, AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. 3. TO ADVANCE ACTIVITIES BOTH WITHIN THE UK OFFICE AND OVERSEAS BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NORTH AND EAST LONDON, ESSEX, HARINGEY, HACKNEY, ENFIELD AND UK AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stand In The Gap
Community House, Room 4,
311 Fore St,
Edmonton,
London
N9 0PZ
- Phone:
- 02083736376
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window