COR BRO OGWR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To foster and promote public knowledge and appreciation of choral music by means of public performance. To advance the musical education of young people through choral work and providing them with opportunities to perform.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bridgend
- City Of Swansea
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 11 March 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FREDERICK JOHN TROTTER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Catharine Clubb | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catharine Rachel Bray | Trustee | 17 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Fabian | Trustee | 08 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN JAMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR R C HUDD | Trustee |
|
||||||
TREVOR GLYN HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.48k | £7.09k | £11.74k | £13.95k | £16.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.47k | £5.73k | £9.99k | £15.66k | £15.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.40k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 APRIL 2002 AS AMENDED 16 FEBRUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
THE CHOIR'S OBJECTS ARE: (I) TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF CHORAL MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE. (II) TO ADVANCE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PERFORMANCES OF CHORAL WORK, THE PROMOTION OF PARTICIPATION IN THE CHOIR AND THE PROVISION OF A PLATFORM FOR YOUNG INSTRUMENTALISTS AND SINGERS AT CONCERTS GIVEN BY THE CHOIR FOR THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BRIDGEND COUNTY BOROUGH, CITY AND COUNTY OF SWANSEA & VALE OF GLAMORGAN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tamara Cottage
Llysworney
Cowbridge
Cowbridge
Vale of glamorgan
CF71 7NQ
- Phone:
- 01446773432
- Email:
- jtrotter246@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window