THAMES HOSPICE

Charity number: 1108298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The local charity supporting people living in East Berkshire and South Buckinghamshire, providing expert nursing and medical care, with emotional and practical support for adults who have illnesses from which they are not expected to recover. Our free of charge care and support extends to family, friends and carers: in our hospice; at our Community Therapy Unit and patients' homes, 365 days a year

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bracknell Forest
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Reading
  • Slough
  • Surrey
  • West Berkshire
  • Windsor And Maidenhead
  • Wokingham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 February 2005: Standard registration
  • 15 March 2023: Funds received from 1095655 WINDSOR DEDWORTH MANOR TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THAMES HOSPICECARE (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTOPHER GRANT AITKEN Chair 08 September 2022
THE PRINCE PHILIP TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE WINDSOR BENEFIT TRUST
Received: On time
THE FOUNDATION OF THE COLLEGE OF ST GEORGE WINDSOR CASTLE
Received: On time
ST. GEORGE'S HOUSE TRUST (WINDSOR CASTLE)
Received: On time
WINDSOR AND ETON CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE WINDSOR AND ETON SOCIETY INCORPORATING WINDSOR HERITAGE
Received: On time
NANCY BARBER Trustee 14 September 2023
None on record
Frances Lawrence Trustee 16 May 2022
None on record
Alice Hunt Trustee 16 May 2022
None on record
JONATHAN TOOHEY Trustee 21 December 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS, SANDHURST
Received: On time
THE ORDERS AND MEDALS RESEARCH SOCIETY
Received: On time
Janet King Trustee 11 June 2020
PAUL BEVAN CANCER FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Dr Judith Kinder Trustee 04 December 2017
None on record
BRUCE MONTGOMERY Trustee 07 September 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.63m £13.04m £15.54m £16.66m £16.82m
Total expenditure £10.40m £11.25m £13.52m £15.28m £17.02m
Income from government contracts £522.15k N/A N/A N/A £6.06m
Income from government grants £2.56m £7.05m £7.09m £4.78m N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.05m £3.88m £4.22m £5.66m £5.15m
Income - Other trading activities £2.73m £1.96m £4.00m £5.00m £5.31m
Income - Charitable activities £3.47m £4.23m £7.22m £5.79m £6.13m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £290.00k £93.00k £93.00k £162.00k £198.00k
Income - Other £94.00k £2.88m £0 £38.00k £34.00k
Income - Legacies £1.61m £620.00k £718.00k £1.06m £752.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.25m £6.35m £7.54m £8.79m £9.79m
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.15m £4.90m £5.98m £6.49m £7.23m
Expenditure - Governance £87.00k £245.00k £319.00k £360.00k £478.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £25.00k £0 £0 £31.00k £38.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £20.96m £22.63m £22.25m £21.84m £21.30m
Long-term investments £3.11m £3.00m £5.51m £6.73m £7.34m
Other assets £3.20m £6.60m £6.42m £6.42m £6.32m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £2.20m £5.17m £2.13m £1.97m £1.73m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 23 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 February 2024 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 06 February 2024 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 04 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Thames Hospice
Windsor Road
MAIDENHEAD
Berkshire
SL6 2DN
Phone:
01753842121