MOTHER OF PEACE COMMUNITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CONTINUED RAISING OF FUNDS FROM DONATIONS, CONVENANTS AND FUND RAISING ACTIVITIES TO SUPPORT MOTHER OF PEACE COMMUNITY ZIMBABWE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 15 April 2005: Standard registration
- 04 August 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- MOPC (Working name)
- MOTHER OF PEACE (Working name)
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.17k | £15.74k | £12.83k | £20.25k | £33.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.31k | £8.57k | £28.52k | £22.54k | £30.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 24 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 24 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 DECEMBER 2004, AS AMENDED 19 MARCH 2005 AND 7 JUNE 2009 AND 22 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE DESTITUTE OR ORPHANED AS A RESULT OF THE HIV/AIDS PANDEMIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A LOVING CHRISTIAN HOME WITHIN THE MOTHER OF PEACE ORPHANAGE IN THE MUTOKO AREA OF ZIMBABWE AND WHERE POSSIBLE GUIDE THEIR REINTEGRATION INTO SOCIETY. (2) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS OF MEMBERS OF THE LOCAL RURAL COMMUNITY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES AND/OR THE PROVISION OF HEALTH EDUCATION AND CARE.
Area of benefit
THE MUTOKO AREA OF ZIMBABWE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window