HOLY TRINITY PRESCHOOL (SUTTON COLDFIELD)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It's a pre-school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £1,100 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 02 February 2005: Standard registration
- HOLY TRINITY PRE-SCHOOL LIMITED SUTTON COLDFIELD (Working name)
- HOLY TRINITY PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Manveer Singh Punia | Chair | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ismah Sarfraz | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Evans | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Jelf | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Somerville | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Madonna Michelle Keates | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Barnett | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Kate Tonsley | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Brook | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Twell | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Sheasby | Trustee | 20 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Dolan | Trustee | 20 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.23k | £126.98k | £110.96k | £101.23k | £97.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.27k | £98.99k | £106.96k | £114.98k | £104.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.42k | N/A | £1.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 July 2023 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 July 2023 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 31 July 2020 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 31 July 2020 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 APRIL 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 FEBRUARY 2004
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: 1. OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION MEANS OR ABILITY; 2. ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS; 3. INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE SUTTON COLDFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLY TRINITY PRESCHOOL (SUTTON COLD
GEORGE WILLIAMS HOUSE
WATSON CLOSE
ST. BERNARDS ROAD
SUTTON COLDFIELD
B72 1LE
- Phone:
- 0121 355 0790
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window