AL-AMEEN FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity runs a number of educational activities, including an Islamic primary school and evening and weekend club. The charity also takes part in fund raising activities for various projects. These include raising awareness and funds for the victims of the tsunamis, earthquakes, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 29 June 2005: Standard registration
- 05 October 2015: Removed (Transferred to exempt chy)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2008 | 31/05/2009 | 31/05/2010 | 31/05/2011 | 31/05/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.34k | £189.29k | £170.01k | £182.89k | £273.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £200.59k | £224.39k | £178.95k | £203.93k | £213.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2012 | 05 September 2013 | 158 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2012 | 05 September 2013 | 158 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 19 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN BIRMINGHAM IN PARTICULAR MEMBERS OF THE ETHNIC MINORITY MUSLIM COMMUNITIES BY; 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION 2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, AND; 3) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES OF RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window