R4R, RESOURCES FOR RELIEF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide the continuing aid required by those who were adversely affected by the War in Sri Lanka, in particular the Wanni region. In particular support is being provided to widows of the war and projects to help individuals rebuild their livelihoods through farming projects, sewing centres and other similar projects. Projects will also include providing aid / materials to rebuild homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 28 April 2005: Standard registration
- R4R (Working name)
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arjuna Ranganathan | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
KANDIAH PACKIANATHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NAMASIVAYAM SELVARAJAH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.85k | £4.52k | £3.00k | £6.55k | £3.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.15k | £2.00k | £2.13k | £6.60k | £4.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 September 2024 | 320 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31 MARCH 2005.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AND THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONGST THOSE AFFECTED BY THE TSUNAMI IN MULLAITIVU, NORTH EAST SRI LANKA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF HOUSES FOR THE HOMELESS AND ORPHANAGES.
Area of benefit
MULAITIVU, NORTH THE EAST SRI LANKA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 THE NEWLANDS
WALLINGTON
SM6 9JX
- Phone:
- 02086477703
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window