HOME-START CROYDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A voluntary home visiting service offering emotional support and practical help to families under stress where there is at least one child under five.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £122,102 from 4 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
Governance
- 31 January 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARBARA FROST | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nessa Cecilia Keddo | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Elizabeth Cloves | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Marianne Butlin | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tiffany Bethan Watts | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abhai Bhargava | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally Elizabeth Cloves | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £203.43k | £268.85k | £186.93k | £181.82k | £256.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £258.05k | £233.91k | £235.23k | £181.78k | £224.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £99.94k | £99.94k | £94.81k | £79.99k | £122.10k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.65k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 July 2024 | 180 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 July 2024 | 180 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 JULY 2004.
Charitable objects
(A) TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN. (B) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN. (C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN. (D) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE WITHIN THE AREA OF LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Home Start Croydon
1-8 Ramsey Court
122 Church Street
CROYDON
CR0 1RF
- Phone:
- 02086670207
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window