ST NICOLAS SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1107964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We hold fundraising activities in school and outside of school hours eg Summer Fair, Quiz Nights, Cake Sales, Christmas Fair to raise money to help provide resources for our School.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £26,043
Total expenditure: £18,704

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Brighton And Hove

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 February 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Siobhan Rosana Scott Trustee 03 October 2024
None on record
Johannah Kate Davies Trustee 03 October 2024
None on record
Fiona James Trustee 03 October 2024
None on record
Sarah Frances Williams Trustee 03 October 2024
None on record
annmarie grice Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
samantha marie ball Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Gary Chapman Trustee 14 April 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £13.62k £12.33k £23.33k £23.31k £26.04k
Total expenditure £21.83k £12.95k £14.57k £29.91k £18.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 08 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 08 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 18 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 31 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Nicolas Primary School
Locks Hill
Portslade
BRIGHTON
BN41 2LA
Phone:
01273418026
Website:

No information available