Financial history MICHAEL CORNISH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1107890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £226.07k £155.11k £77.96k £56.09k £81.79k
Total expenditure £225.75k £257.56k £246.07k £418.50k £237.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A