CALVARY CHAPEL BIRMINGHAM LIMITED

Charity Number: 1107980
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Christian Church

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £151,867
Total expenditure: £107,976

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 February 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • CALVERY CHAPEL BIRMINGHAM LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pastor David Toro Chair 17 January 2015
None on record
Thomas Flanagan Trustee 17 January 2018
None on record
Juan Toro Trustee 17 January 2018
None on record
Michael Dorsch Trustee 17 January 2018
None on record
James McGill Rousseau Trustee 05 December 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £61.75k £88.40k £79.70k £85.09k £151.87k
Total expenditure £64.53k £85.97k £75.93k £88.39k £107.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 01 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 07 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 23 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
131 Shenley Fields Road
BIRMINGHAM
B29 5BB
Phone:
01213550388