Accounts and annual returns ASIAN EYE CARE TRUST OF STOKE

Charity number: 1111103
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2009 19 March 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2008 19 March 2010 262 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not Required