Accounts and annual returns ABOUT WITH FRIENDS

Charity number: 1109000
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 12 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 09 August 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 06 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 23 July 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 09 February 2015 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 10 September 2014 On Time