Financial history SLOUGH WEEKEND ISLAMIC SCHOOL

Charity number: 1108723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.23k £6.17k £10.55k £27.43k £55.20k
Total expenditure £17.30k £6.94k £10.83k £21.29k £40.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A