RUTLAND CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity Number: 1107907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Rutland Citizens Advice Bureau helps people resolve their legal, money and other problems by providing information and advice, and by influencing policymakers.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £484,846
Total expenditure: £443,199

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Rutland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 February 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Cooper Chair 01 April 2020
None on record
Barbara Coulson Trustee 10 December 2024
None on record
Margaret Susan Jarron Trustee 09 May 2023
None on record
Christopher Charles Mortlock Trustee 09 May 2023
LAXTON VILLAGE HALL NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Received: On time
Hannah Adele Williams Trustee 22 November 2022
None on record
Alastair Michael Cropper Trustee 07 October 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £659.65k £590.92k £724.05k £464.26k £484.85k
Total expenditure £713.12k £622.68k £690.15k £399.51k £443.20k
Income from government contracts £504.70k £504.70k £504.70k £65.00k £75.50k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.00k £170.00k £241.58k
Income - Donations and legacies £37.11k £43.15k £56.87k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £525 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £619.74k £546.45k £666.24k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £2.28k £1.32k £952 N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £677.37k £611.65k £649.56k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £35.74k £11.03k £40.59k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £38.53k £29.03k £53.32k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £69.06k £12.85k £11.04k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 February 2024 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 February 2024 20 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
56 HIGH STREET
OAKHAM
RUTLAND
LE15 6AL
Phone:
01572723494