DICKENS HEATH COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising to provide additional equipment and facilities for the pupils of Dickens Heath Community Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Solihull
Governance
- 15 February 2005: Standard registration
- DICKENS HEATH CPS PARENTS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Liz Butler | Chair | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Huckerby | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leonie Campbell | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Parnaby | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Williams | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Chadaway | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Laurent | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Margaret Knight | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Bevan | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kay Faulkner | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.35k | £2.47k | £9.57k | £15.88k | £17.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.75k | £848 | £17.00k | £11.29k | £18.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MAY 2004 AS AMENDED ON 18 OCT 2017 as amended on 23 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; (2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF DICKENS HEATH COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
DICKENS HEATH PRIMARY SCHOOL
THREE ACRES LANE
SHIRLEY
SOLIHULL
B90 1NA
- Phone:
- 0121 733 8359
- Email:
- ptfa@dickensheath.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window