Accounts and annual returns THE MONTPELLIER TRUST

Charity Number: 1108119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 07 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 02 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 05 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 05 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 06 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 18 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required