WEST OXFORD U3A

Charity number: 1108125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Educational and recreational activities for people not in full-time employment

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,259
Total expenditure: £4,260

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 February 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Beverley Birmingham Chair 23 May 2016
None on record
Ruth Felicity Finar Trustee 21 June 2023
None on record
Inga Lill Martin Trustee 06 September 2021
None on record
Russell Derek Warburton Ansell Trustee 23 August 2021
None on record
Elisabeth Froggatt Trustee 22 May 2017
None on record
Elizabeth Louise Jones Trustee 23 May 2016
None on record
ELIZABETH DAVIS STEVENS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.79k £480 £2.03k £2.20k £3.26k
Total expenditure £4.71k £1.31k £2.64k £2.00k £4.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 February 2024 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 February 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
34 Binsey Lane
OXFORD
OX2 0EX
Phone:
01865249828