Trustees BOURNE VALLEY GOOD NEIGHBOUR LINK SCHEME
Charity number: 1108029
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAUREEN ELIZABETH ATKINSON | Chair |
|
||||||
Tracey Welch | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Dennis Andrews | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Leonie Elizabeth Louise Winborn | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS R MILES | Trustee | 10 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER SMITH | Trustee | 08 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
LINDA BUCKLE | Trustee | 08 January 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.