CARING WHISPERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a charity we support people with Eating Disorders and also support their carers. we support people in one-to-one sessions as well as group and family sessions. we also provide advice and information. we support schools and universities as well as training. we are based in Morecambe but we support people throughout the North West.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
Governance
- 07 February 2005: Standard registration
- 21 June 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- EATING DISORDER NETWORKS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.98k | £54.98k | £46.55k | £22.54k | £3.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.99k | £45.03k | £42.68k | £33.18k | £4.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 30 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 23 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 23 November 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 06 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 08 December 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 NOVEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEVE OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM EATING DISORDERS; 2) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF EATING DISORDERS AND THEIR CARERS; 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE NATURE AND TREATMENT OF PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSE AND TREATMENT OF EATING DISORDERS AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. 4) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSE AND TREATMENT OF EATING DISORDERS AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window