CHURCHGATE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the trust are to: +ö+ç+¦ The advancement of education +ö+ç+¦ The promotion of moral or spiritual improvement, in particular but not exclusively by the provision of facilities to religious foundations +ö+ç+¦ The relief of poverty +ö+ç+¦ The relief of sickness or disability
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 April 2005: Standard registration
- CCT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PRIYA BHAYANI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMEET KOTECHA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.80k | £16.50k | £16.98k | £117.08k | £300.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.31k | £17.77k | £13.39k | £73.90k | £52.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2022 | 368 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 MARCH 2005 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 18 JUNE 2010.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SEE FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; (B) THE PROMOTION OF MORAL OR SPIRITUAL IMPROVEMENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO RELIGIOUS FOUNDATIONS; (C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; (D) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF DISABILITY; (E) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; (F) THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE OR CATASTROPHE; AND (G) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
227 London Road
Romford
Essex
RM7 9BQ
- Phone:
- 01708380940
- Email:
- MAIL@BOUTIQUECAREHOMES.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window