Financial history HOME-START KNOWSLEY

Charity number: 1107933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £206.66k £392.99k £250.85k £249.17k £268.80k
Total expenditure £198.22k £283.29k £211.28k £276.97k £323.99k
Income from government contracts N/A £4.78k £9.49k £21.49k £32.26k
Income from government grants N/A £111.79k £9.01k £21.49k £39.38k