Accounts and annual returns SAMARITAN TRUST FOR THE POOR AND NEEDY

Charity number: 1109741
Charity reporting is overdue by 307 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 307 days
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 307 days
Annual return 30 August 2022 14 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2021 15 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2020 02 July 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2019 29 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2019 Not Required