IMAN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes Education/Training Religious activities and sermons Enhancing religious harmony
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 16 February 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Knowsley
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 24 March 2005: Standard registration
- ISLAMIC CENTRE FOR ST HELENS AND KNOWSLEY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ahmed Abd El-Gawad | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Irfan Ullah KHAN | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ahmad Omar | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Azam Ali | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr OMAR SHAIKH | Trustee | 01 October 2007 |
|
|
||||
Dr SARFARAZ KHAN | Trustee | 01 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
Dr ABUBAKER ELBADRI | Trustee | 01 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
Dr MOHAMMAD AL-JUBOURI | Trustee | 01 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
Dr IFTIKHAR MOBIN KHAN | Trustee | 01 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
Dr AKHTAR ALI AKHTAR | Trustee | 01 March 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 16/02/2020 | 16/02/2021 | 16/02/2022 | 16/02/2023 | 16/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.73k | £102.88k | £76.53k | £97.26k | £75.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.61k | £148.67k | £35.76k | £28.45k | £53.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 16 February 2024 | 15 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 February 2024 | 15 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 16 February 2023 | 04 August 2024 | 232 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 February 2023 | 04 August 2024 | 232 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 16 February 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 February 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 16 February 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 February 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 16 February 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 February 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 MARCH 2005 AS AMENDED 11 MAY 2007
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE ISLAMIC RELIGION BY ESTABLISHMENT OF AN ISLAMIC CENTRE AND FACILITIES FOR THE PRACTICE OF ISLAMIC RELIGION AND COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES. 2) ADVANCEMENT OF ISLAMIC EDUCATION BY PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS. 3) PROMOTING RELIGIOUS HARMONY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE ST HELENS KNOWSLEY AND HALTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MICHAELS MOUNT
ELTON HEAD ROAD
ST. HELENS
WA9 5AU
- Phone:
- 01744813490
- Email:
- imantrust@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window