REFUGEE YOUTH PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with community based partners to provide support and activities for young refugees and asylum seekers in the UK and overseas. We encourage refugee youth participation in project planning, implementation and evaluation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Barnet
- Lebanon
- Nepal
Governance
- 18 April 2005: Standard registration
- 18 September 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 18 September 2012: Funds transferred to 1139685 YOUNG ROOTS
- RYP (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2006 | 30/11/2007 | 30/11/2008 | 30/11/2009 | 30/11/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.14k | £44.61k | £91.37k | £63.85k | £69.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.52k | £49.73k | £85.04k | £63.72k | £62.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2010 | 29 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2010 | 29 September 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 November 2009 | 30 September 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2009 | 30 September 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 November 2008 | 29 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2008 | 29 September 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 DECEMBER 2004, AS AMENDED 20 MARCH 2005
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG YOUNG FORCED MIGRANTS/LONG TERM REFUGEES (THE BENEFICIARIES), BOTH WITHIN THE UK AND OVERSEAS, BY PROVISION OF TRAINING AS YOUTH WORKERS AND IN THE FIELD OF HUMAN RIGHTS AWARENESS. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG THE BENEFICIARIES BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER VOLUNTARY BODIES, LOCAL AUTHORITIES, RELIEF AGENCIES AND OTHERS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE 3. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
UK AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window