Accounts and annual returns HARVEY GIRLS

Charity number: 1109234
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 30 August 2011 21 June 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2011 21 June 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2010 29 June 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 29 June 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2009 29 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 14 May 2010 On Time