Accounts and annual returns CHELTENHAM CIRENCESTER AND TEWKESBURY CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1109816
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 05 November 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 06 April 2014 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 04 December 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 21 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 12 November 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 09 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 12 December 2011 On Time