Accounts and annual returns NADA UK LIMITED

Charity number: 1111984
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2017 16 April 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 10 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 04 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required