THE BURTON BRADSTOCK VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We manage and maintain a community centre (Village Hall) for the people of Burton Bradstock
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 21 February 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD FERRE | Chair | 26 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Carole Ann Houghton | Trustee | 02 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisanne Mealing | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Page | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Charles Page | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Page | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Rawlinson | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Clark | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tina Christine Huggins | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Tompkins | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Keith Britton | Trustee | 31 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Lomax | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
VAL FERRE | Trustee | 17 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAN CLARK | Trustee | 17 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.29k | £23.60k | £19.26k | £20.22k | £23.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.33k | £9.32k | £17.09k | £29.99k | £20.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £17.43k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 JANUARY 2004
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF BURTON BRADSTOCK IN THE COUNTY OF DORSET (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
BURTON BRADSTOCK
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 The Flax Mill
Mill Street
Burton Bradstock
BRIDPORT
DT6 4GG
- Phone:
- 01308897384
- Email:
- pandt52@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window