Financial history FARINGDON INFANT SCHOOL H.S.P.

Charity Number: 1108221
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013
Total gross income £4.86k £20.10k £8.23k £5.33k £4.15k
Total expenditure £3.65k £8.46k £21.67k £6.42k £2.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A