DOXEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the integration of residents into the community. To create and support activities for the local residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 14 April 2005: Standard registration
- DCA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DENISE PATRICIA ANN PEEL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MARK SMITH | Trustee | 16 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARIE SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR P H FIRMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROB BELCHER | Trustee |
|
||||||
ISABELLA DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANITA KAY SUMNER-SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SALLY JAYNE HEMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.25k | £2.72k | £310 | £290 | £31 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.12k | £2.41k | £711 | £463 | £465 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 548 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 548 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 913 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 913 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1278 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1278 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1643 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1643 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JANUARY 2005, AS AMENDED 31 DECEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE TO: PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF DOXEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS AND PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
DOXEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
262 DOXEY
STAFFORD
ST16 1EB
- Phone:
- 01785605653
- Email:
- chair@doxeyca.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window