FINANCIAL INCLUSION SERVICES (YORKSHIRE) LTD

Charity Number: 1109539
Charity reporting is up to date (90 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Meeting needs of financially excluded in and around Sheffield area. FISY incorporates projects which meet this aim, including a Money Adviser and a Financial Capability project. Currently includes administering grants on behalf of Sheffield City Council's Employability Project.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £13,081
Total expenditure: £13,081

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 May 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • FISY (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Savage Trustee 25 May 2022
None on record
Christopher Kearton Trustee 20 May 2021
None on record
Richard Edwards Trustee 21 May 2015
None on record
MAXINE STAVRIANAKOS Trustee 15 August 2011
None on record
PETER RICHARD ARMSTRONG Trustee
None on record
CHRISTINE URSELL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £21.08k £20.05k £25.78k £28.96k £13.08k
Total expenditure £21.08k £20.05k £25.78k £28.96k £13.08k
Income from government contracts N/A £6.46k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 28 October 2024 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 02 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 02 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 24 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 24 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 04 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 23 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Sheffield Credit Union
35 Townhead Street
SHEFFIELD
S1 2EB
Phone:
07578764534