M AND L COHEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1108246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General Charitable Activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £91,790
Total expenditure: £69,513

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bolton
  • Bury
  • Manchester City
  • Oldham
  • Rochdale
  • Salford City
  • Stockport
  • Tameside
  • Trafford
  • Wigan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 February 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gavriel Cohen Trustee 20 February 2025
None on record
MAX COHEN Trustee
CHABAD RETREAT CENTRE
Received: On time
EZRAS RINOH
Received: On time
KAHAL CHASSIDIM LUBAVITCH MANCHESTER
Received: On time
LEAH COHEN Trustee
A S CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.08k £51.00k £61.40k £70.72k £91.79k
Total expenditure £43.19k £35.28k £80.60k £68.05k £69.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
28 NEW HALL ROAD
SALFORD
M7 4HS
Phone:
01617373300
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available