Financial history FROME CHEESE & GRAIN LIMITED

Charity number: 1108074
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £445.18k £356.67k £579.17k £1.18m £1.53m
Total expenditure £520.79k £362.20k £495.34k £1.28m £1.47m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £215.06k £85.87k £45.25k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £7.60k £58.50k £33.88k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £129.01k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £267.68k £1.11m £1.43m
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £174.88k £11.80k £64.04k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £495.34k £1.28m £1.47m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0