ABC TALES FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational advance for disadvantaged people. Literacy and writing opportunities for all. Providing a supportive and actively inclusive creative writing community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 April 2005: Standard registration
- ABCTF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Robert Stewart | Chair | 26 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Morwenna Chillds | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jon Gummerson | Trustee | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ewan Alexander Lawrie | Trustee | 15 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claudine Lazar | Trustee | 26 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Coral Jane | Trustee | 26 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £926 | £771 | £1.37k | £614 | £1.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £480 | £480 | £297 | £1.00k | £1.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 21 February 2023 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 21 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 JANUARY 2002, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 MARCH 2005.
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, AMONG DISADVANTAGED AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, BY THE PROVISION OF LITERACY CLASSES, TUTORIALS AND WORKSHOPS. 2. TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jacob Ting & Co
40 Homer Street
LONDON
W1H 4NL
- Phone:
- 07759941005
- Email:
- rachel@abctales.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window