SOUTH ATLANTIC MEDAL ASSOCIATION 82 WALES BRANCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary purpose of SAMAWALES is to maintain and promote a sense of pride and comradeship amongst all veterans of the 1982 Falklands Conflict. We assist and support veterans and families with PTSD and other mental and physical illnesses. We reunite comrades and friends through private and social reunions/meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 27 May 2005: Standard registration
- 13 November 2018: Removed (Removed by application)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.99k | £2.35k | £4.84k | £5.24k | £5.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.32k | £5.64k | £520 | £5.37k | £4.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 30 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 07 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 25 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 12 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MAY 2005
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES BY MAINTAINING CONTACT BETWEEN SERVING MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES AND MEMBERS AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES WHO SERVED IN THE 1982 FALKLAND CONFLICT. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES IN MATTERS RELATING TO THE 1982 FALKLANDS CONFLICT AND IN PARTICULAR THE CONTRIBUTION OF SERVICE PERSONNEL FROM WALES. (3) TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A MEMORIAL TO THOSE SERVICE PERSONNEL AND CIVILIANS FROM WALES WHO DIED DURING THE 1982 FALKLANDS CONFLICT. (4) TO RELIEVE SERVING AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO SERVED IN THE 1982 FALKLANDS CONFLICT WHO ARE IN NEED BY VIRTUE OF HARDSHIP, SICKNESS OR OLD AGE: A)MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM OR B)PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM OR C) MARKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE "IN NEED".
Area of benefit
WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window