Trustees FRIENDS OF ALL SAINTS CHURCH, OLD HEATHFIELD
Charity number: 1108281

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Basil Saunders | Chair | 25 March 2014 |
|
|||||
Robert John Bellis | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Richard Greener | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Nevill | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Rosemary Carolyn Soward | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Colne | Trustee | 24 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Michael Norman | Trustee | 09 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JAMES | Trustee | 28 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANN KENWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD DAVID LEEVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NIGEL LAWRENCE COLNE CBE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.