Financial history FRESH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1108079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.21k £23.21k £11.74k £13.41k £1.22k
Total expenditure £1.20k £13.18k £10.23k £22.77k £2.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A