GRANGE SCHOOL AYLESBURY

Charity Number: 1110039
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sponsored Activities, Donations, Quiz Nights, Tombolas, Jumble Sales, Raffles, Table Top Sales, Fun Days, Fund Raising Evenings, Community Days, Open Days, Sports Days, Residential Visits for Young People with Teachers, Extra Curricular Activities, School Productions.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £2,062
Total expenditure: £2,175

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 June 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GRANGE SCHOOL FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
VINCE MURRAY Trustee
None on record
MR A SHERWELL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £11.72k £15.48k £2.75k £0 £2.06k
Total expenditure £11.78k £9.56k £2.75k £690 £2.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 09 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE GRANGE SCHOOL
WENDOVER WAY
AYLESBURY
HP21 7NH
Phone:
01296390900