NEW FUTURES PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
From our base in Leicester we operate a drop in facility for people exploited by or at risk of sexual exploitation. We carry out two out reach sessions in the City two nights a week and bi weekly out reach sessions during the day to the county. We provide access to City Council housing services, Drug and Alcohol workers, GUM and GP services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
57 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Rutland
Governance
- 21 February 2007: Standard registration
- NFP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vicki Holden | Chair | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
LISA SWANN DAVIE | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
PAULA JAYNE McMANUS | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rose NGUKU | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Beverly Carr | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Jordan Roscoe | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £354.58k | £657.03k | £389.27k | £345.58k | £388.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £304.45k | £553.05k | £467.67k | £383.07k | £428.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £648.83k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £8.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £553.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £27.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 25 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF WOMEN, GIRLS, MEN AND BOYS IN LEICESTER, LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND WHO ARE INVOLVED IN PROSTITUTION, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF STREET OUTREACH, A DROP-IN FACILITY, AND PRACTICAL CARE, ADVICE AND GUIDANCE. 3.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION REGARDING PROSTITUTION AND ITS IMPACT ON INDIVIDUALS AND SOCIETY
Area of benefit
LEICESTER, LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
71 London Road
Leicester
LE2 0PE
- Phone:
- 01162510803
- Email:
- maggie@new-futures.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window