THE SAWBRIDGEWORTH ORPHANAGE IN SRI LANKA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RAISE FINANCES TO FURTHER THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF CHILDREN IN ST JOSEPH'S CHIDREN'S HOME ORPHANGE IN KEGALLE SRI LANKA TO PROMOTE AND BUILDING OF FACILITIES TO PROVIDE A REGULAR SUM ANNUALLY TO FULLFILL THESE AIMS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 24 March 2005: Standard registration
- 20 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SOISL (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2013 | 31/01/2014 | 31/01/2015 | 31/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.69k | £1.26k | £1.57k | £1.08k | £1.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.76k | £1.74k | £1.74k | £1.74k | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2017 | 17 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2016 | 19 January 2017 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2015 | 17 February 2016 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST FEBRUARY 2005 AS AMENDED 16TH MARCH 2005
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: TO RELIEVE THOSE IN FINANCIAL NEED, TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF DISABLED ORPHANED CHILDREN UP TO THE AGE OF 16 YEARS IN SRI LANKA AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE FOREGOING BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING AN ORPHANAGE OR ORPHANAGES.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS, SRI LANKA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window