IGREJA EVANGELICA LUSO-BRASILEIRA EM BOURNEMOUTH ( BRAZILIAN-PORTUGUESE EVANGELICAL CHURCH IN BOURNEMOUTH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian Faith and the worship of God in the United Kingdom and overseas, and Teaching of Christian doctrine and principles. (Preaching, teaching,printing and distribution of the literature) The world-wide advancement of education on the basis of christian principles. The world-wide relief of persons who are in conditions of need or distress or who are aged or sick.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 February 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR Renato Afonso Fernandes | Chair | 09 January 2005 |
|
|
||||
SONIA SILVA FERNANDES | Trustee | 09 January 2005 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL BISPO DO CARMO | Trustee | 09 January 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/05/2020 | 30/05/2021 | 30/05/2022 | 30/05/2023 | 30/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.11k | £211.85k | £228.34k | £224.98k | £263.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £190.67k | £225.95k | £212.76k | £222.80k | £236.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 May 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2023 | 29 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2023 | 29 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2022 | 15 June 2023 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2022 | 15 June 2023 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2021 | 03 October 2022 | 187 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2021 | 03 October 2022 | 187 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 May 2020
(These accounts |
01 April 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 JANUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS (HEREINAFTER CALLED " THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE INCLUDING VIDEO AND AUDIO RECORDINGS OR TAPES AND BY ANY OTHER MEDIA WHICH IS OR MAY BECOME AVAILABLE. 2. THE WORLD-WIDE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK. 3. THE WORLD-WIDE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROVISION OF SUCH EDUCATION IN ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT AND IF THE TRUSTEES SO DECIDE THE PROVISION OF ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS FOR THE GENERAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OR ADULTS ON THE BASIS OF SUCH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Igreja Evangelical Luso'brasileira
16 Albert Road
BOURNEMOUTH
BH1 1BZ
- Phone:
- 01202298452
- Email:
- ielb@ielb.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window