SRI GURU SINGH SABHA GURDWARA LETCHWORTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The religious services are provided every morning and evening. Dedicated services on every Saturday afternoon Dedicated services on every Sunday morning until afternoon. We have started Punjabi classes for all ages and future would open maths, English & computer classes. Yoga classes started last year
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 15 February 2005: Standard registration
- SIKH COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TEMPLE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohinder Singh Parhar | Chair | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bahadur Singh Sandhu | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Avtar Singh Sandhu | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deepak Singh Sangha | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kamalveer Kaur | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kraig Jagpal | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ravinder Singh Aujla | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jagmohan Singh Johal | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £199.51k | £82.11k | £191.16k | £176.64k | £170.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £467.42k | £190.60k | £136.76k | £89.90k | £122.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 JANUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE SIKH FAITH WITHIN THE SIKH AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY IN LETCHWORTH GARDEN CITY AND SURROUNDING AREAS OF NORTH HERTFORDSHIRE.
Area of benefit
LETCHWORTH GARDEN CITY AND SURROUNDING AREAS OF NORTH HERTFORDSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BEHIND IRVIN HOUSE
ICKNIELD WAY
LETCHWORTH GARDEN CITY
HERTFORDSHIRE
SG6 1EF
- Phone:
- 01462685029
- Email:
- sangha55@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window