Trustees SRI GURU SINGH SABHA GURDWARA LETCHWORTH
Charity number: 1108102

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohinder Singh Parhar | Chair | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bahadur Singh Sandhu | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Avtar Singh Sandhu | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deepak Singh Sangha | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kamalveer Kaur | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kraig Jagpal | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ravinder Singh Aujla | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jagmohan Singh Johal | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.