DORSET MIND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dorset Mind supports people with mental health problems in Dorset.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£966,894
Donations and legacies | £501.27k | |
Charitable activities | £462.02k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £3.61k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,329,154
Raising funds | £20.15k | |
Charitable activities | £1.31m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £433,570 from 9 government contract(s) and £36,000 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £20.15k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.31m |
People

53 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
88 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Poole
Governance
- 17 February 2005: Standard registration
- 17 January 2023: Funds received from 1137221 LEIGH PARK (WIMBORNE MINSTER) COMMUNITY ASSOCIATIO...
- BOURNEMOUTH POOLE & DISTRICT MIND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Hendrick Alberts | Chair | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Butcher | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Crompton | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Wootten | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Hurll | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ben Lawes | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Evans | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rosalind Maycock | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laurence Mynors-Wallis | Trustee | 03 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £645.91k | £810.82k | £944.25k | £1.37m | £966.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £614.47k | £661.03k | £915.10k | £1.29m | £1.33m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £19.34k | £19.34k | £19.34k | £408.78k | £433.57k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.71k | N/A | £47.50k | £36.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £495.26k | £761.33k | £730.59k | £894.97k | £501.27k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £149.80k | £49.40k | £213.63k | £469.11k | £462.02k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £894.97k | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £847 | £87 | £36 | £2.06k | £3.61k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £603.04k | £656.30k | £899.69k | £1.27m | £1.31m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £11.43k | £4.72k | £15.41k | £15.99k | £20.15k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £855 | £525 | £600 | £3.75k | £679 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £16.03k | £16.30k | £11.66k | £17.54k | £9.05k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £269.44k | £419.15k | £739.54k | £542.43k | £208.15k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £16.75k | £16.95k | £303.54k | £42.17k | £61.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 JANUARY 2005. as amended on 26 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
The charities objects are specifically restricted to the following: To promote the preservation of good mental health in particular by enabling and empowering everyone experiencing mental health problems to live with, manage and, where possible, recover. To promote mental health by working to increase the understanding of mental health and mental health problems by gathering and disseminating information and working to raise awareness, promote understanding and challenge stigma and discrimination. Nothing in the articles shall authorise the application of the property of the charity for purposes which are not charitable in accordance with section 7 of the Charities and Trustee Investment (Scotland) Act and/or section 2 of the Charities Act (Northern Ireland 2008).
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGH OF BOURNEMOUTH, THE BOROUGH OF POOLE, THE COUNTY OF DORSET AND BORDERING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dorset Mind
Unit 8 Stratfield Saye
20-22 Wellington Road
Bournemouth
Dorset
BH8 8JN
- Phone:
- 01202 315329
- Email:
- contact@dorsetmind.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window