SAVE JAMAICA FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1.The advancement of education among poor children under the age of 18 residing in Jamaica 2.To advance the education and broaden the knowledge of UK residents 3.The relief of poverty, hardship and distress among homeless persons in Jamaica, 4.To provide and run a UK based volunteer network which educates, trains and provides support for disadvantaged Jamaican citizens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 July 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
- Jamaica
Governance
- 04 May 2005: Standard registration
- 12 March 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/08/2006 | 01/07/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.04k | £16.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.68k | £14.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 July 2007 | 20 February 2009 | 295 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2007 | 17 October 2008 | 169 days late | |
Annual return | 01 August 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2006 | 23 August 2007 | 83 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JULY 2004, AS AMENDED 10 APRIL 2005 AND 10 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG POOR CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 18 RESIDING IN JAMAICA, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF LEARNING RESOURCES AND EQUIPMENT AND FINANCIAL RESOURCES 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND BROADEN THE KNOWLEDGE OF UK RESIDENTS, THROUGH THE TEACHING AND TRAINING OF ALL SUBJECTS RELATING TO JAMAICA, IN PARTICULAR; CULTURE, ARTS, LITERATURE, HISTORY, HEALTH, HERITAGE, LIFE AND POVERTY IN THIRD WORLD COUNTRIES, IN PARTICULAR, JAMAICA 3. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG HOMELESS PERSONS IN JAMAICA, IN PARTICULAR THE ELDERLY, SICK, DISABLED OR THOSE WITH CHILDREN, BY THE PROVISION OF NEW SHELTERS AND THE RENOVATION OF EXISTING SHELTERS 4. TO PROVIDE AND RUN A UK BASED VOLUNTEER NETWORK WHICH EDUCATES, TRAINS AND PROVIDES SUPPORT FOR DISADVANTAGED JAMAICAN CITIZENS
Area of benefit
JAMAICA AND UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window