Financial history TAI PAWB

Charity number: 1110078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £357.99k £309.28k £439.31k £555.21k £573.74k
Total expenditure £351.60k £288.96k £398.63k £484.70k £529.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £173.60k £179.89k £173.60k £208.08k £237.74k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £541.24k £555.91k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £503 £920
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £13.47k £16.91k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £484.70k £529.68k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0