Trustees TAI PAWB
Charity number: 1110078

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Asmut Price | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mariam Elmirghani | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Dowdall | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Jayne Hamer | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Tracy Jones | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cerys Clark | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Gilbert | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Craig Stephenson | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Prescott | Trustee | 20 January 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.