Accounts and annual returns EXETER CITY SWIMMING CLUB

Charity number: 1112308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 18 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 18 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 25 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 25 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 05 August 2022 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 05 August 2022 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 August 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 11 August 2021 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 27 September 2020 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 27 September 2020 59 days late Download Open in new window