Financial history EXETER CITY SWIMMING CLUB

Charity number: 1112308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £384.11k £299.14k £216.00k £466.07k £460.43k
Total expenditure £412.09k £305.34k £253.00k £446.08k £440.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A